Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTRANSGENDER LAW CENTER et al v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02153
Date Filed2021-08-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffTRANSGENDER LAW CENTER
PlaintiffRAPID DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe Transgender Law Center and Rapid Defense Network submitted four FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning policies and guidance for the treatment of transgender individuals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Transgender Law Center and Rapid Defense Network filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Choice of format, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-121COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8663226) filed by TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER, RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Summons to ICE, # 10 Summons to DOJ, # 11 Summons USAO, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK, TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-12Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-254RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/17/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/16/2021. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-265ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK, TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER re 1 Complaint, 2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA upon US Dep't of Justice by certified mail . (Kelley, Matthew) Modified on 8/26/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-26NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 5 Certificate of Service, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED AS TO FEDERAL DFTS" event (zjf) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-09-036NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/03/2021)
2021-09-167ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-168MOTION to Consolidate Cases by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-179RESPONSE re 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Consent to Consolidation filed by RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK, TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar