Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTRANSGENDER LAW CENTER et al v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02155
Date Filed2021-08-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffTRANSGENDER LAW CENTER
PlaintiffRAPID DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe Transgender Law Center and Rapid Defense Network submitted FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning mental and physical policies for transgendered individuals as well as the treatment of transgender individuals who had been detained by ICE. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Transgender Law Center and Rapid Defense Network filed suit.
Complaint issues: Choice of format, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-121COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8663400) filed by TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER, RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Summons to USAO, # 6 Summons to ICE, # 7 Summons DOJ, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK, TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-12Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-254RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/17/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/16/2021. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/23/2021. (Kelley, Matthew) Modified event on 9/9/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-09-036NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/03/2021)
2021-09-167ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-168NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-17MINUTE ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 1, 2021. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/17/2021. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-179NOTICE of Response to Motion to Consolidate and Consent to Consolidation by RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK, TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER re 8 Notice (Other) (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-2010Case directly reassigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth as related. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar