Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRapid Defense Network et al v. United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv06788
Date Filed2021-08-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul G. Gardephe
PlaintiffRapid Defense Network
PlaintiffTransgender Law Center
Case DescriptionThe Rapid Defense Network and the Transgender Law Center submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning transgendered individuals in detention. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Rapid Defense Network and the Transgender Law Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-121COMPLAINT against United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement . (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24924074)Document filed by Rapid Defense Network, Transgender Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4).(Schell, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-122FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement c/o United States Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rapid Defense Network , Transgender Law Center..(Schell, Jacquelyn) Modified on 8/12/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-123REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rapid Defense Network , Transgender Law Center.(Schell, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-124REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement c/o United States Attorney's Office, SDNY, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rapid Defense Network, Transgender Law Center..(Schell, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-125REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement c/o United States Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rapid Defense Network , Transgender Law Center..(Schell, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-126CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schell, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-127RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rapid Defense Network, Transgender Law Center.(Schell, Jacquelyn) M (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-13***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacquelyn Nicole Schell. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: RAPID DEFENSE NETWORK, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-13CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-13Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-13Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-138ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-139ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement..(vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-1310ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-1811NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Court for an initial pretrial conference in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on November 18, 2021 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/18/2021) (ate) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-1812NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/18/2021) (jca) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-2313CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Jacquelyn Nicole Schell on behalf of Transgender Law Center. Re: 11 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,, 12 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,,. Certificate of Service .(Schell, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 08/23/2021)
2021-08-2414NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tomoko Onozawa on behalf of United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement..(Onozawa, Tomoko) (Entered: 08/24/2021)
2021-08-2515AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. Service was accepted by Dominic Bettiea, US Attorney's Office, SDNY. Document filed by Rapid Defense Network ; Transgender Law Center..(Schell, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-2516AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint, etc. served on US Immigration & Customs Enforcement c/o US Dep't of Justice on 8/20/2021. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Rapid Defense Network, Transgender Law Center..(Schell, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-09-1617ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement..(Onozawa, Tomoko) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-1718MOTION for Matthew Edward Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25078012. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rapid Defense Network, Transgender Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew E. Kelley, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-20>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 18 MOTION for Matthew Edward Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25078012. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-2019ORDER granting 18 MOTION for Matthew Edward Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/20/2021) (jca) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar