Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02168
Date Filed2021-08-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerica First Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning reports referred to in the Weekly Reporting of All Enforcement and Removal Actions in a memo from Tae Johnson to ICE employees. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told America First that it was invoking a 10-day extension to respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, America First Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8666657) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-13Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-163SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-164STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/16/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-255RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/23/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/22/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of K. Robinson)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-256RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. Defendants UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY; UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served 08/20/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Robinson)(Field, Brian) Modified text to add service date on 8/26/2021 (ztd). (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-257RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/23/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Robinson)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-09-228ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Rosen-Shaud, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-22MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before November 22, 2021, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear telephonically for an initial scheduling conference on November 29, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. The parties will receive a teleconference number and access code from the Deputy Clerk prior to the teleconference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/22/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar