Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePARTIALLY IMPORTANT PRODUCTIONS, LLC v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02169
Date Filed2021-08-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffPARTIALLY IMPORTANT PRODUCTIONS, LLC
Case DescriptionPartially Important Productions, which produced Last Week Tonight With John Oliver, submitted a request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the settlement negotiations between musician Lee Greenwood and the agency for copyright infringement of Greenwood's song "God Bless the USA." Partially Important Productions also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied PIP's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PIP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8667454) filed by PARTIALLY IMPORTANT PRODUCTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PARTIALLY IMPORTANT PRODUCTIONS, LLC (Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-16Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-163SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-204CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PARTIALLY IMPORTANT PRODUCTIONS, LLC re 1 Complaint, . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service, # 2 Affidavit of service)(Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 08/20/2021)
2021-09-225NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-226ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar