Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMontana Environmental Information Center v. United States Bureau of Land Management
DistrictDistrict of Montana
CityHelena
Case Number6:2021cv00063
Date Filed2021-08-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Sam E Haddon
PlaintiffMontana Environmental Information Center
Case DescriptionThe Montana Environmental Information Center submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning federal mining claims in Meagher County applied for and acquired by Tintina Montana. MEIC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, MEIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-131COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against United States Bureau of Land Management, filed by Montana Environmental Information Center. (HEG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2021: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG). (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-13Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2711709 (HEG) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-132Summons Issued as to United States Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney. Original summons emailed to counsel for service. (Attachments: # 1 Garland Summons, # 2 Leif Johnson Summons) (HEG) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-09-203Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Tyson M. Lies appearing for Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lies, Tyson) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-204ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant may have up to and including October 12, 2021, to file an answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/20/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar