Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLongas-Palacio v. Jaddou et al
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityHouston
Case Number4:2021cv02661
Date Filed2021-08-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David Hittner
PlaintiffJohanna Longas-Palacio
Case DescriptionJohanna Longas-Palacio submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning her Alien file. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Longas-Palacio filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUr Mendoza Jaddou
DefendantMerrick Garland
DefendantJennifer Lowery
DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-161COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26902331) filed by Johanna Longas-Palacio.(Williamson, Peter) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-162Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Williamson, Peter) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-173Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, filed.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-174ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-09-175CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Johanna Longas-Palacio, filed.(Williamson, Peter) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar