Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleManley v. Locsin et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityRome
Case Number4:2021cv00157
Date Filed2021-08-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mark H. Cohen
PlaintiffMr. Eric Manley
Case DescriptionEric Maney filed suit against Teodoro Locsin, a consular affairs officer at the Department of State dealing with the Philippines charging that he had failed to provide Maney's son with medical care. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantConsular Affairs Teodoro L. Locsin, Jr. "individual and official" capacity
DefendantJose Manuel "Babe" del Gallego Romualdez "individual and official" capacity
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-171COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eric Maney. (Filing fee $402, receipt number GAN100132222) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-172STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/17/2021. (tmf) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-17Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Maney re 2 Order. (tmf) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-193MOTION for US Marshall Service by Eric Maney. (dob) (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-194Summons Issued as to Teodoro L. Locsin, Jr., Jose Manuel "Babe" del Gallego Romualdez. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Romualdez)(tmf) Modified on 8/19/2021 to edit text(tmf). (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-20Submission of 3 MOTION for US Marshall Service, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (tmf) (Entered: 08/20/2021)
2021-09-145ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Eric Manley ("Manley")'s Motion to For Service of Defendants by the United States Marshal [Doc. 3 ] is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to change Plaintiff's name in the caption of this case from "Eric Maney" to "Erie Manley." Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/13/2021. (tmf) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar