Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTahirih Justice Center v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2021cv00934
Date Filed2021-08-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge T. S. Ellis, III
PlaintiffTahirih Justice Center
Case DescriptionThe Tahirih Justice Center submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the agency's decision to change its policy to give priority to the most recently filed asylum applicants. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Tahirih Justice Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-06-091COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16060525.). Filed byTahirih Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 6/9/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/09/2021)
2021-06-092Proposed Summons. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 6/9/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/09/2021)
2021-06-103Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/24/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/10/2021)
2021-06-104Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/10/2021)
2021-06-105Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/10/2021)
2021-06-106MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Alicia J. LeDuc (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16065030) filed by Tahirih Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 6/10/2021) Modified on 6/11/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/10/2021)
2021-06-157Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tahirih Justice Center (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 6/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-06-24Electronic filing error . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel must file their own Pro Hac Vice Application using their own ECF Profiles to appear on the docket. This filing will not be proc essed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Alicia J. LeDuc filed by Tahirih Justice Center. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/24/2021)
2021-06-248MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Alicia LeDuc ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16065030.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/10/21 filed by Tahirih Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(LeDuc, Alicia) (Filed on 6/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/24/2021)
2021-06-259ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to of Alicia LeDuc. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/25/2021)
2021-06-2510CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/25/2021)
2021-06-2911CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tahirih Justice Center.. (LeDuc, Alicia) (Filed on 6/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/29/2021)
2021-06-3012CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-07-0113ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 7/1/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-0114REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, September 2, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-1415AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Case Management Order, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure, and all initial case filings served on United States Citizenship and Immigration Services on 6/30/21, filed by Tahirih Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services via certified mail, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services FOIA Office via certified mail)(LeDuc, Alicia) (Filed on 7/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)
2021-07-1416AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Case Management Order, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure, and all initial case filings served on United States Department of Homeland Security on 6/30/21, filed by Tahirih Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service as to US Department of Homeland Security via certified mail, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service as to US Department of Homeland Security FOIA Office via certified mail)(LeDuc, Alicia) (Filed on 7/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)
2021-07-1417AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Case Management Order, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure, and all initial case filings via certified mail served on United States Department of Justice, Attorney General on 6/30/21, filed by Tahirih Justice Center. (LeDuc, Alicia) (Filed on 7/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)
2021-07-2818NOTICE of Appearance by Shiwon Choe for Defendants (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 7/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 07/28/2021)
2021-07-2819STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint to 8/6/2021 filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 7/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 07/28/2021)
2021-08-0420NOTICE by Tahirih Justice Center Withdrawal of Attorney Alicia LeDuc (LeDuc, Alicia) (Filed on 8/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 08/04/2021)
2021-08-0621STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint to 8/13/2021 filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 8/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-0622NOTICE of Appearance by Monder Khoury (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 8/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-1223STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) and STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 8/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-1624Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 23 Stipulation to Transfer Case. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-1725Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-04440. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-09-1626Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spavins, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-1627ORDER granting 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time ; directing that Defendants will answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before Thursday, September 30, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 21-934. (dest) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-1728Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Monder Khoury and Certification of Local Counsel Patrick John Curran Jr Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8001546. by Tahirih Justice Center. (Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-1729Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Burke and Certification of Local Counsel Patrick John Curran Jr Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8001764. by Tahirih Justice Center. (Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar