Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHLASS et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02200
Date Filed2021-08-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffLAILA L. HLASS
PlaintiffDOOR - A CENTER OF ALTERNATIVES
Case DescriptionLaura Hlass, a law professor at Tulane University Law School specializing in immigration law, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning applications for Special Immigrant Juvenile Status for fiscal years prior to 2010. She also requested updated data since 2010. She also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Hlass that her request was considered a simple request for processing purposes. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Hlass filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8675231) filed by LAILA L HLASS, THE DOOR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons 1, # 5 Summons 2, # 6 Summons 3)(Renenger, Aaron) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-18Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-09-203NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-204RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 8/23/2021 (Renenger, Aaron) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/23/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/22/2021. (Renenger, Aaron) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-206RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General August 23, 2021. (Renenger, Aaron) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar