Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUST FUTURES LAW v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02208
Date Filed2021-08-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJUST FUTURES LAW
Case DescriptionJust Futures Law submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning a list of companies offering personal data collection, storage, analysis, and distribution that have contracts with DHS. Just Futures Law also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged of the request and told Just Futures Law that it was referring the request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Just Futures Law filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUS IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-191COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8678242) filed by Just Futures Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons US Attorney, # 5 Summons Attorney General, # 6 Summons DHS, # 7 Summons ICE)(Zota, Sejal) (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-192NOTICE of Appearance by Sejal Zota on behalf of Just Futures Law (Zota, Sejal) (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-193LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Just Futures Law (Zota, Sejal) (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-20NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to sejal@justfutureslaw.org, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)
2021-08-204CIVIL COVER SHEET by JUST FUTURES LAW filed by JUST FUTURES LAW.(Zota, Sejal) (Entered: 08/20/2021)
2021-08-23Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 08/24/2021)
2021-08-245SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/24/2021)
2021-08-256MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dinesh McCoy, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8691220. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JUST FUTURES LAW. (Zota, Sejal) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-267MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin L. Herrera, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8691639. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JUST FUTURES LAW. (Zota, Sejal) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-30MINUTE ORDER: granting 6 7 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Dinesh McCoy and Kevin Herrera are admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8 /30/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-09-018NOTICE of Appearance by Dinesh Keith McCoy on behalf of JUST FUTURES LAW (McCoy, Dinesh) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-079NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Herrera on behalf of JUST FUTURES LAW (Herrera, Kevin) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/9/2021) (znmw). (Entered: 09/07/2021)
2021-09-1010RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/30/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons USPS online verification)(Herrera, Kevin) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-1011RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/30/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/29/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons USPS online verification)(Herrera, Kevin) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-1012RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/27/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Summons USPS online verification)(Herrera, Kevin) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-1013RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 8/30/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Summons USPS online verification)(Herrera, Kevin) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar