Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02213
Date Filed2021-08-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT
Case DescriptionWhite Coat Waste Project submitted a FOIA request to the Drug Enforcement Administration for records concerning the contract and statement of work of Institutional Animal Care and Use Committee approved protocols. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WCWP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Defendant2255
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8679510) filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons Request to DOJ, # 3 Summons Summons Request to US Attorney General, # 4 Summons Summons Request to US Attorney's Office for DC)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-20Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)
2021-08-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)
2021-09-154Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-17MINUTE ORDER. 4 Motion to Enlarge Time is GRANTED. Defendant must respond to plaintiff's complaint by October 26, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/17/2021. (lcabj1) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar