Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCODREA v. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02201
Date Filed2021-08-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffDAVID CODREA
Case DescriptionDavid Codrea, a blogger on Second Amendment issues, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning the investigation of an incident in which a gun belonging to Hunter Biden disappeared from his vehicle. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and initially told Codrea that it found no records. The agency withdrew its no records response and told Codrea that unless it he could show a public interest in disclosure, disclosure would violate Hunter Biden's privacy. Codrea argued that 22 House members wanted the investigation pursued. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Codrea filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-181COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8675297) filed by DAVID CODREA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ATF FOIA, # 2 Exhibit Acknowledgement Letter, # 3 Exhibit Final Response (first), # 4 Exhibit Final Response (second), # 5 Exhibit Letter to Siple, # 6 Exhibit ATF Appeal, # 7 Exhibit Appeal Denial, # 8 Summons Summons on AG, # 9 Summons Summons on ATF, # 10 Summons Summons on Civil Process Clerk, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-18Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-09-103RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/7/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/7/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES served on 9/7/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/7/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Delivery Confirmation, # 2 Exhibit USPS Delivery Confirmation, # 3 Exhibit USPS Delivery Confirmation)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar