Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-08-23 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Land Home Financial Services Inc. (Filing fee paid $ 402.). Filed byMarcus Manning, Viridiana Lopez Garcia. Consent/Declination due by 9/7/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Filing Fee Receipt, # 3 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021) (Entered: 08/24/2021) |
2021-08-23 | 2 | Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/24/2021) |
2021-08-23 | 3 | Summons Issued as to Land Home Financial Services Inc.. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021) (Entered: 08/24/2021) |
2021-08-25 | 4 | NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 08/25/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Self Help Flyer, # 2 Pro Se Handbook)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/25/2021) |
2021-09-10 | 5 | CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2021 . (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/10/2021) |
2021-09-20 | 6 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marcus Manning.. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021) (Entered: 09/21/2021) |
2021-09-22 | 7 | CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/22/2021) |
2021-09-23 | 8 | ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/23/22. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/23/2021) |
2021-09-23 | 9 | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/23/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/23/2021) |
2021-09-27 | 10 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus Manning. Land Home Financial Services Inc. served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021) |
2021-10-06 | 11 | MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief can be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(6)) filed by Land Home Financial Services Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2021 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/20/2021. Replies due by 10/27/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Thomas, Ryan) (Filed on 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021) |
2021-10-06 | 12 | Certificate of Interested Entities by Land Home Financial Services Inc. (Thomas, Ryan) (Filed on 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021) |
2021-10-07 | | Electronic filing error . Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents .This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: 12 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Land Home Financial Services Inc. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021) (Entered: 10/07/2021) |
2021-10-08 | 13 | Certificate of Interested Entities by Land Home Financial Services Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Cavco Industries, Inc., Other Affiliate Fannie Mae, Other Affiliate Brad Waite, Other Affiliate John Waite, Other Affiliate David Waite, Other Affiliate Brenda Usher, Other Affiliate Raylen Gritton, Other Affiliate Tony Wicke for Land Home Financial Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Thomas, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021) |
2021-10-25 | 14 | OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief can be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(6)) ) filed byMarcus Manning. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021) (Entered: 10/26/2021) |
2021-10-27 | 15 | REPLY (re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief can be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(6)) ) filed byLand Home Financial Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Thomas, Ryan) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021) |
2021-11-04 | 16 | CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - Motion Hearing reset for 12/3/2021 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recordin g, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.usc ourts.gov/zoom/ . (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/04/2021) |
2021-11-09 | 17 | RESPONSE re 15 Reply to Opposition/Response, by Viridiana Lopez Garcia, Marcus Manning. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021) (Entered: 11/09/2021) |
2021-11-30 | 18 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Land Home Financial Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Thomas, Ryan) (Filed on 11/30/2021) Modified on 12/1/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/30/2021) |
2021-12-03 | 19 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2021 re 11 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion is granted with leave to amend. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2021) (Entered: 12/03/2021) |
2022-01-11 | 20 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Land Home Financial Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Thomas, Ryan) (Filed on 1/11/2022) (Entered: 01/11/2022) |
2022-01-11 | 21 | First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Land Home Financial Services Inc.. Filed by Marcus Vernon Manning. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022) Modified on 1/12/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/12/2022 (ark, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2022) |
2022-01-11 | 22 | **FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE 23 FOR CORRECTED FILING** NOTICE by Marcus Vernon Manning (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Envelope)(kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022) Modified on 1/12/2022 (ark, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2022) |
2022-01-11 | 23 | MOTION for ORDER OF POSSESSION OF PROPERTY filed by Viridiana Lopez Garcia, Marcus Vernon Manning. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 1/25/2022. Replies due by 2/1/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Envelope)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022) |
2022-01-14 | 24 | CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, a nd rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourt s.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) (Entered: 01/14/2022) |
2022-01-18 | 25 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 1/18/2022. The First Amended Complaint for Replevin is STRUCK. Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022) |
2022-01-18 | 27 | Certificate of Interested Entities by Viridiana Lopez Garcia, Marcus Vernon Manning (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022) |
2022-01-18 | 28 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Viridiana Lopez Garcia, Marcus Vernon Manning. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022) |
2022-01-19 | 26 | JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/19/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 01/19/2022) |
2022-01-19 | 29 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Land Home Financial Services Inc. re 25 Case Management Conference - Further, 26 Judgment,, Terminated Case, (Thomas, Ryan) (Filed on 1/19/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |