Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBADER FAMILY FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES COMMISSION ON CIVIL RIGHTS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02237
Date Filed2021-08-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffBADER FAMILY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Bader Family Foundation submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Commission on Civil Rights for records concerning electronic communications sent by Catherine Lhamon or Katherine Culliton-Gonzalez. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked the Bader Family Foundation to narrow the scope of its request. BFF did so. The agency denied the request because it did not specifically describe the records sought. BFF filed an administrative appeal. The agency denied the appeal on the same basis as it had denied the request. BFF then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES COMMISSION ON CIVIL RIGHTS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES COMMISSION ON CIVIL RIGHTS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8685764) filed by BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for the US Attorney, # 3 Summons for the agency, # 4 Summons)(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 08/23/2021)
2021-08-232REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Summons for the US Attorney, # 2 Summons for the agency, # 3 Summons for the Attorney General)(Bader, Hans) Modified on 8/24/2021 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 08/23/2021)
2021-08-24Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 08/24/2021)
2021-08-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES COMMISSION ON CIVIL RIGHTS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/24/2021)
2021-08-244STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/24/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 08/24/2021)
2021-08-255ERRATA to Complaint by BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION re 1 Complaint, filed by BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-09-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/24/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/23/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES COMMISSION ON CIVIL RIGHTS served on 9/1/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/30/2021. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-227NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of UNITED STATES COMMISSION ON CIVIL RIGHTS (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-228Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES COMMISSION ON CIVIL RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the consent motion for extension of time, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before November 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/22/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar