Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKAPLAN v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02248
Date Filed2021-08-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffMICHAEL KAPLAN
Case DescriptionMichael Kaplan submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning Form I-213s sent to the Miami ICE office from January 201 to January 2021. Kaplan limited his request to non-personally identifying data elements. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Kaplan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-241COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8688620) filed by MICHAEL KAPLAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Greim, Edward) (Entered: 08/24/2021)
2021-08-25NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to edgreim@gravesgarrett.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-252ERRATA Complaint by MICHAEL KAPLAN. (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-26Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-303SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar