Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02253
Date Filed2021-08-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerica First Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's decision to terminate its investigation into the origins of COVID-19. AFLF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told AFLF that it would not be able to respond within 20 days. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AFLF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8689043) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A:FOIA Request 5-28-21, # 2 Exhibit B: FOIA Acknowledgment 5-28-21, # 3 Exhibit C: Status Update 7-21-21, # 4 Exhibit D: Status Request Update 8-2-21, # 5 Exhibit E: Status Request Update 8-3-21, # 6 Exhibit F: Status Request Update 8-4-21, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-26Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmg) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-304ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/30/2021. (DM) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-09-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/30/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/29/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Robinson)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
2021-09-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/7/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Robinson)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
2021-09-087RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/30/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Robinson)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar