Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02257
Date Filed2021-08-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning calendars and meetings, decisions, and keywords from the January 6 investigation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8690442) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to DOD)(Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-26Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-303SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar