Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHuddle v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
DistrictNorthern District of Ohio
CityToledo
Case Number3:2021cv01652
Date Filed2021-08-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jeffrey J. Helmick
PlaintiffSteve H. Huddle
Case DescriptionSteve Huddle submitted FOIA requests to the FBI and the CIA. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Huddle filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-251Complaint against Federal Bureau of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency. Filing fee paid. $402. Receipt # 34660012624. Filed by Steve H. Huddle. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Energy Engineering for Effects and Using your Sixth Sense, # 4 Envelope) (H,JL) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-25Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (H,JL) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-25Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (H,JL) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-252Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation through U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (H,JL) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-25Copy of 1 Complaint, 2 Summons mailed to Steve H. Huddle at Heritage Villiage, Room 115 a, 555 Anthony Wayne Trail, Waterville, OH 43566 on 8/25/2021. Related document(s) 1 , 2 . (H,JL) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-25Remark by Clerk re Service Upon U.S. Government Defendant. If a U.S. Government agency or officer is sued, you must provide summons for that defendant, for the U.S. Attorney General (Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. 20530) and the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio (801 West Superior Avenue, Suite 400, Cleveland, OH 44113-1852). (H,JL) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-09-093Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Plaintiff Steve H. Huddle. (K,AR) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar