Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY v. ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02267
Date Filed2021-08-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning revisions of regulations pertaining to genetically engineered organisms. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-261COMPLAINT against ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8693750) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-263MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Audrey Leonard, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8694496. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-30Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-304SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-305STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/30/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Center for Food Safety's motion to appear pro hac vice, Dkt. 3 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Audrey Leonard is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a). Click here for instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/30/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-09-136NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey Leonard on behalf of CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Leonard, Audrey) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar