Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02269
Date Filed2021-08-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Case DescriptionAmerican Center for Law and Justice submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning applications for tax exemptions from the internal revenue code. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ACLJ filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-261COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8694176) filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Summons to IRS, # 4 Summons to U.S. Attorney for DC, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sisney, Benjamin) (Attachment 6 replaced on 9/3/2021) (znmw). (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-263NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Paul Sisney on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-30Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-304SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-09-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/1/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/1/2021. (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/02/2021)
2021-09-086NOTICE to the Court by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (IRS Letter))(Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
2021-09-097NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-168RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 9/7/2021 (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-169RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/08/2021. (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-2010Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-2011NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Hunsader on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar