Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCoca v. Executive Office for Immigration Review et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityKey West
Case Number4:2021cv10088
Date Filed2021-08-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jose E. Martinez
PlaintiffLuis Alfredo Anibal Coca
Case DescriptionLuis Coca submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for Immigration Review for records concerning his removal order. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Coca filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-271First PETITION (Complaint) To Enforce Freedom of Information Act Response RE: Government Agency . Filing fee $ 49.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14964182, filed by Luis Alfredo Anibal Coca. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s))(Smerdon, Bonnie) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-08-272Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-08-273Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Insufficient filing fee paid. Filer must file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee and electronically pay the correct fees of $ 402.00 within 24 hours. Filing fees will be refunded. Amount $49.00, receipt #AFLSDC-14964182, case filed date: 8/27/2021. (pcs) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-08-274Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Insufficient filing fee paid. (pcs) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-08-275Noticing INS Attorney Added for Defendants. (pcs) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-08-276Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee $402.00, receipt number AFLSDC-14964320, Electronic Civil Case Filing re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (Smerdon, Bonnie) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-08-277Summons Issued as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pcs) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-09-228Clerks Notice of Filing Fee refunded to Bonnie Smerdon in the amount of $49.00 on 09/22/2021 re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (mua) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar