Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-08-18 | | Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/18/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-18 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by FRANCISCO PICHARDO. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zsb) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-18 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FRANCISCO PICHARDO. (zsb) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-18 | 3 | PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by FRANCISCO PICHARDO (zsb) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-18 | 4 | MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (See docket entry 1 to view document) by FRANCISCO PICHARDO. (zsb) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-31 | 5 | ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $25.87 from Prison Account of FRANCISCO PICHARDO and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/30/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 09/03/2021) |
2021-08-31 | 6 | ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this case randomly to a judge For further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/31/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 09/03/2021) |
2022-01-31 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 01/31/2022) |
2022-01-31 | 7 | SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service (zsb) (Entered: 01/31/2022) |
2022-02-02 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/1/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/01/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/1/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/3/2022.) (zjf) (Entered: 02/07/2022) |
2022-03-03 | 9 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 03/03/2022) |
2022-03-04 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that defendant's response to the complaint is due by April 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/4/22. (DMK) (Entered: 03/04/2022) |
2022-04-04 | 10 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 04/04/2022) |
2022-04-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before May 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/5/2022. (DMK) (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-04-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before May 3, 2022. (jth) (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-05-03 | 11 | STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/03/2022) |
2022-05-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's 11 Status Report by June 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/4/2022. (psu3) (Entered: 05/04/2022) |
2022-05-04 | | Set/Reset Deadline: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's 11 Status Report is due by 6/3/2022. (jth) (Entered: 05/04/2022) |
2022-07-14 | | MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On May 3, 2022, the defendant filed a 11 Status Report, indicating that, aside from a copy of a "release letter" that was provided to the plaintiff, the other materials sought in the plaintiff's FOIA request were categorically exempt from disclosure, and therefore, it would not be releasing them. The defendant also proposed that the plaintiff submit a response to its Status Report, indicating whether or not he was satisfied with the agency's response. On May 4, 2022, the Court entered a Minute Order, directing the plaintiff to file a response to the defendant's Status Report by June 3, 2022. That deadline has since elapsed, and to date, the plaintiff has not filed a response or sought any extension to do so. Therefore, is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff SHOW CAUSE in writing, by August 15, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) and D.C. Local Civil Rule 83.23. Failure to respond may result in the dismissal of the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/14/2022. (psu3) (Entered: 07/14/2022) |
2022-07-14 | | Set/Reset Deadline: Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, by 8/15/2022, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (jth) (Entered: 07/14/2022) |
2022-12-19 | 12 | ORDER DISMISSING the Complaint, ECF No. 1, and this case, without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) and D.C. LCvR 83.23. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/19/2022. (psu3) (Entered: 12/19/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |