Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-08-23 | 1 | COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice, The, United States of America, The (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000925) filed by Jody Blackmoon, Terry Hodgkiss, William Lefthand, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Mailing Envelope)(mf) (Entered: 08/23/2021) |
2021-08-23 | 2 | Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice, The, United States of America, The, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mf) (Entered: 08/23/2021) |
2021-08-26 | 3 | *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jody Blackmoon, Terry Hodgkiss, William Lefthand, Jr. United States Department of Justice, The served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021 (Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 8/27/2021 to restrict access. (js) (Entered: 08/26/2021) |
2021-08-26 | 4 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jody Blackmoon, Terry Hodgkiss, William Lefthand, Jr (Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 08/26/2021) |
2021-08-26 | 5 | SUMMONS Returned Executed as to The United States Department of Justice served on 8/26/2021, answer due 10/25/2021; and The United States of America served on 8/26/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (js) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-27 | | DOCKET CORRECTION re: 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA at 5 . (js) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-09-17 | 6 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States Department of Justice, The, United States of America, The. (Wall, Sarah) (Entered: 09/17/2021) |
2021-09-17 | 7 | (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (BG) (Entered: 09/17/2021) |
2021-10-20 | 8 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Justice, The, United States of America, The. (Wall, Sarah) (Entered: 10/20/2021) |
2021-10-21 | 9 | (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Department of Justice, answer due 11/24/2021; United States of America, answer due 11/24/2021. (LC) (Entered: 10/21/2021) |
2021-11-23 | 10 | MOTION for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim , MOTION to Dismiss Non-FOIA Claim by United States Department of Justice, The, United States of America, The. (Wall, Sarah) (Entered: 11/23/2021) |
2021-11-23 | 11 | MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim MOTION to Dismiss Non-FOIA Claim filed by United States Department of Justice, The, United States of America, The. (Wall, Sarah) (Entered: 11/23/2021) |
2021-11-23 | 12 | AFFIDAVIT of Vinay J. Jolly re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim MOTION to Dismiss Non-FOIA Claim , 11 MEMORANDUM in Support by United States Department of Justice, The, United States of America, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA/PA Request Letter dated April 19, 2021, # 2 Exhibit B - EOUSA Response Letter dated April 26, 2021, # 3 Exhibit C - Appeal to Office of Information Policy dated May 18, 2021, # 4 Exhibit D - Office of Information Policy's Response to Appeal Letter, dated July 7, 2021)(Wall, Sarah) (Entered: 11/23/2021) |
2021-11-23 | 13 | AFFIDAVIT of Sarah E. Wall re 11 MEMORANDUM in Support, 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim MOTION to Dismiss Non-FOIA Claim by United States Department of Justice, The, United States of America, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E - State Court Index #57 Wood's Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Request No. 2, # 2 Exhibit F - State Court Index #58 Stipulated Discovery Order and Protective Order)(Wall, Sarah) (Entered: 11/23/2021) |
2021-11-24 | 14 | E-Filing Modification Request re 12 Affidavit,, (cjs) (Entered: 11/24/2021) |
2021-11-26 | 15 | AFFIDAVIT of Vinay J. Jolly re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim MOTION to Dismiss Non-FOIA Claim , 11 MEMORANDUM in Support by United States Department of Justice, The, United States of America, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA/PA Request Letter dated April 19, 2021, # 2 Exhibit B - EOUSA Response Letter dated April 26, 2021, # 3 Exhibit C - Appeal to Office of Information Policy dated May 18, 2021, # 4 Exhibit D - Office of Information Policy's Response to Appeal Letter dated July 7, 2021)(Wall, Sarah) (Entered: 11/26/2021) |
2021-12-13 | 16 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: 10 United States' Motion for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim and Motion to Dismiss on Non-FOIA Claim by Jody Blackmoon, Terry Hodgkiss, William Lefthand, Jr. (Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 12/14/2021 to add link. (sj). (Entered: 12/13/2021) |
2021-12-14 | 17 | (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response is due on or before 1/13/2022. (MM) (Entered: 12/14/2021) |
2021-12-14 | | DOCKET CORRECTION re: 16 MOTION. Clerk's Office added link. (sj) (Entered: 12/14/2021) |
2021-12-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines as to 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim MOTION to Dismiss Non-FOIA Claim . Responses due by 1/13/2022 (mf) (Entered: 12/14/2021) |
2022-01-11 | 18 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim, MOTION to Dismiss Non-FOIA Claim by Jody Blackmoon, Terry Hodgkiss, William Lefthand, Jr. (Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 1/12/2022 to add link. (jb) (Entered: 01/11/2022) |
2022-01-12 | | DOCKET CORRECTION re: 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Clerk's office added link. (jb) (Entered: 01/12/2022) |
2022-01-12 | 19 | (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment/Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 2/22/2022. (MM) (Entered: 01/12/2022) |
2022-02-22 | 20 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim, MOTION to Dismiss Non-FOIA Claim by Jody Blackmoon, Terry Hodgkiss, William Lefthand, Jr. (Dickson, Thomas) Modified to add link on 2/25/2022 (pb). (Entered: 02/22/2022) |
2022-02-25 | | DOCKET CORRECTION re: 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Clerk's Office added link. (pb) (Entered: 02/25/2022) |
2022-03-01 | 21 | ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting in part and denying in part 20 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiffs' response is due on or before April 15, 2022. (RLB) (Entered: 03/01/2022) |
2022-03-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines as to 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim MOTION to Dismiss Non-FOIA Claim . Responses due by 4/15/2022 (mf) (Entered: 03/01/2022) |
2022-04-18 | 22 | RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim MOTION to Dismiss Non-FOIA Claim filed by Jody Blackmoon, Terry Hodgkiss, William Lefthand, Jr. (Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 04/18/2022) |
2022-04-26 | 23 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on FOIA Claim MOTION to Dismiss Non-FOIA Claim filed by United States Department of Justice, The, United States of America, The. (Wall, Sarah) (Entered: 04/26/2022) |
2022-05-12 | 24 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States Department of Justice, The, United States of America, The. (Wall, Sarah) (Entered: 05/12/2022) |
2022-05-13 | 25 | ORDER Adopting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal by Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(RLB) (Main Document 25 replaced on 5/13/2022 to correct error in document) NEF Regenerated (mf) (Entered: 05/13/2022) |
2022-05-13 | | Civil Case Terminated. (mf) (Entered: 05/13/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |