Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02284
Date Filed2021-08-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning an unredacted version of the Inspector General's investigation of the role of the Park Police in clearing Lafayette Square so that President Trump could take a photo. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-301COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8698633) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Interior OIG)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-30Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-302SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-303LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-314STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 31, 2021. (lcbah4) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-09-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL served on 9/7/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/7/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/7/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/8/21. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar