Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSOLOMON v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02290
Date Filed2021-08-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJOHN SOLOMON
Case DescriptionJohn Solomon of Fox News submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning a letter from June 2015 from Assistant Secretary of State Victoria Nuland to Ukraine Prosecutor General Viktor Shokin. Solomon also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Solomon's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Solomon filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-301COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by JOHN SOLOMON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Della Rocca, Brian) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-30NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to bdellarocca@compass-law.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-312MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Celia H. O'Leary, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8701193. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN SOLOMON. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of C. O'Leary, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Della Rocca, Brian) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-08-313MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kimberly S. Hermann, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8701242. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN SOLOMON. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of K. Hermann, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Della Rocca, Brian) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-08-314ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JOHN SOLOMON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Della Rocca, Brian) Modified on 9/1/2021 (zsb). (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-08-315ERRATA corrected complaint by JOHN SOLOMON re 1 Complaint filed by JOHN SOLOMON. (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Della Rocca, Brian) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-09-01Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-01NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 4 Request for Summons to Issue was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (zsb) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-01NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to bdellarocca@compass-law.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. Please use the FOIA summons at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/Summons-FOIA_2013_FILL.pdf (zsb, ) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-01MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's 2 Motion for Admission of Attorney Celia H. O'Leary Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 1, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-01MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's 3 Motion for Admission of Attorney Kimberly S. Hermann Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 1, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-016STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 1, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-017ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JOHN SOLOMON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Della Rocca, Brian) Modified on 9/1/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-01NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 7 Request for Summons to Issue was entered in error at the request of counsel and will be refiled.(zjf) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-018REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JOHN SOLOMON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Della Rocca, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-079SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/07/2021)
2021-09-2110NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly S. Hermann on behalf of JOHN SOLOMON (Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/21/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar