Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER v. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02291
Date Filed2021-08-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER
Case DescriptionHuman Right Defense Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration for records concerning 11 companies that operated detention centers for the agency. HRDC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted HRDC's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, HRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantIMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-301COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8699264) filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to ICE, # 3 Summons to USAG, # 4 Summons to USAO)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-30Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-302SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-09-013NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Lucas Marshall on behalf of HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Marshall, Daniel) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/1/2021) (ztd). (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-134ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/13/2021. (DM) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar