Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02302
Date Filed2021-08-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Health for records concerning emails sent by NIH Director Francis Collins related to "gain of function," "hydroxychloroquine," "HCQ," and "Wuhan Institute of Virology." The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-301COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8700463) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-302LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-31Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-08-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-09-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/3/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/3/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/13/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 9/10/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-137NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-14NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to lburke@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. DO NOT REFILE - Counsel is reminded to docket all parts of their filing (zjf, ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-14NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to lburke@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel will kindly disregard Notice of Error (zjf, ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar