Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02303
Date Filed2021-08-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the role of the office of United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees in processing asylum seekers in Northern Mexico. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-301COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8700487) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of State)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-302LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-31Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-08-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-08-314STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 31, 2021. (lcbah4) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-09-095NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/3/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/3/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/13/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-138RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/13/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar