Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02309
Date Filed2021-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records concerning audits of La'James International College. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told NSLDN that it could find no responsive records for several requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-311COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8702262) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to USAG, # 3 Summons to US Department of Education, # 4 Summons to DC USAO)(Rothschild, Eric) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-08-312LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Rothschild, Eric) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-09-01Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-024STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 2, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 09/02/2021)
2021-09-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/13/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/13/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/13/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 9/10/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rothschild, Eric) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar