Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInformed Consent Action Network v. National Institutes of Health
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv07331
Date Filed2021-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis J. Liman
PlaintiffInformed Consent Action Network
Case DescriptionThe Informed Consent Action Network submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Health for records concerning the identities of qualified staff who reviewed a 2015 report on whether the Wuhan Virology Lab was involved in gain of function, as suggested by Sen. Rand Paul in a Senate hearing. ICAN also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing from the agency, ICAN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Institutes of Health
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-311COMPLAINT against National Institutes of Health. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25006352)Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A.1 FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A.2 Confirmation of Submission, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A.3 Acknowledgement).(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-08-312CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-08-313REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Institutes of Health, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network..(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-08-314STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-07288. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network..(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-09-01***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Aaron Siri to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Related case number and judge was not noted on the first page of the civil cover sheet. (pc) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-01CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-01Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-01CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 21cv7288. (pc) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-015ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Institutes of Health..(pc) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-016CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-01CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-07288-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-01NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-01Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-177NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on October 8, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-lewis-j-liman. This document should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, which are available on the same webpage. Parties should consult the Individual Practices for guidance on the matters to be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference and for the Court's rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other procedural matters. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/17/2021) (js) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar