Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-09-02 | 1 | COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against National Transportation Safety Board ("NTSB") (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0971-16350061). Filed by Danko Meredith. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Danko, Michael) (Filed on 9/2/2021) (Entered: 09/02/2021) |
2021-09-02 | 2 | Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/16/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021) (Entered: 09/02/2021) |
2021-09-03 | 3 | Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021) (Entered: 09/03/2021) |
2021-09-03 | 4 | Summons Issued as to United States of America. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021) (Entered: 09/03/2021) |
2021-09-15 | 5 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danko Meredith re Summons, Complaint etc. (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021) |
2021-09-15 | 6 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danko Meredith re Summons, Complaint via Certified Mail (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021) |
2021-09-15 | 7 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Danko Meredith.. (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021) |
2021-09-15 | 8 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danko Meredith re 7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021) |
2021-09-15 | 9 | CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |