Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHart v. Facebook, Inc. et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2021cv01543
Date Filed2021-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas J. Whelan
PlaintiffJustin Hart
Case DescriptionJustin Hart filed suit against Facebook and the Department of Health and Human Services after he was removed from Facebook and Twitter for posting false information about the pandemic. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantFacebook, Inc.
DefendantTwitter, Inc.
DefendantVivek Murthy in his official capacity as United States Surgeon General
DefendantJoseph R. Biden, Jr. in his official capacity as President of the United States
DefendantThe Department of Health and Human Services
DefendantThe Office of Management and Budget
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [11]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-311COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Facebook, Inc., Vivek Murthy, The Department of Health and Human Services, The Office of Management and Budget, Twitter, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16089890.), filed by Justin Hart. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:21-cv-1543-MMA-WVG. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Tyler, Robert)(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-012Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd)(sjt). (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-033Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16099792.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Reader, Mallory) (rmc). (Entered: 09/03/2021)
2021-09-034ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Mallory Elizabeth Reader, re 3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/3/2021.(rmc) (Entered: 09/03/2021)
2021-09-035Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16102535.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kelsey, Brian)(rmc). (Entered: 09/03/2021)
2021-09-036ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Brian Kirk Kelsey, re 5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/3/2021.(rmc) (Entered: 09/03/2021)
2021-09-167NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Alan Patchen on behalf of Twitter, Inc. (Patchen, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Alan Patchen added to party Twitter, Inc.(pty:dft) (tcf). (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-168Corporate Disclosure Statement by Twitter, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Patchen, Jonathan) (tcf). (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-169Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Twitter, Inc. (Patchen, Jonathan) (tcf). (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-1610NOTICE of Appearance by Yuhan Chi on behalf of Twitter, Inc. (Chi, Yuhan)Attorney Yuhan Chi added to party Twitter, Inc.(pty:dft) (tcf). (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-1711ORDER Granting 9 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Twitter must respond to the Complaint on or before the Federal Government Defendants' deadline to respond pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(2), which is currently, 11/8/2021. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/17/2021. (tcf) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-2012MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv1543-W-WVG.(no document attached) (fth) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar