Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02371
Date Filed2021-09-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffLOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC
Case DescriptionThe Louise Trauma Center, which advocates on behalf of immigrant women who have suffered gender-based violence submitted 11 FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning s variety of topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Louise Trauma Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8715898) filed by Louise Trauma Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 09/07/2021)
2021-09-09Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (znmg) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-092SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-163RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/15/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/14/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-10-195MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 5 defendant's motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall answer or respond by not later than November 12, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/19/21. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar