Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTAHL v. DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02383
Date Filed2021-09-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAVIVA STAHL
Case DescriptionAviva Stahl, a free-lance journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the Defense Intelligence Agency for records concerning the interrogation of detainee Ali al-Marri by DIA agents. She also requested expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Stahl filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-091COMPLAINT against DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8722139) filed by AVIVA STAHL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to DIA, # 3 Summons to USAG, # 4 Summons to USAO)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-10Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-102SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-10-203ANSWER to Complaint by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-204MINUTE ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before November 3, 2021. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/20/2021. (lcapm2) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar