Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBuzzFeed Inc. v. U.S. Department Of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv07533
Date Filed2021-09-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John G. Koeltl
PlaintiffBuzzFeed Inc.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Justice for records concerning a full copy of the investigative summary published on OIG's website pertaining to findings of misconduct by a former DOJ executive officer for making inappropriate comments constituting sexual harassment. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed 15 pages with redactions under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). BuzzFeed filed an administrative appeal of the redactions. The agency upheld its original denial. BuzzFeed then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25038020)Document filed by BuzzFeed Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A-F, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons).(Swaminathan, Anand) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-10***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Anand Swaminathan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-10***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Anand Swaminathan to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; Nature of suit was not selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-10***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Anand Swaminathan to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-10CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-10Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-10Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-102CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Swaminathan, Anand) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-103REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, United States Attorney's Office, U.S. Attorney General, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by BuzzFeed Inc...(Swaminathan, Anand) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-104NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anand Swaminathan on behalf of BuzzFeed Inc...(Swaminathan, Anand) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-135ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department Of Justice. (sj) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-136FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Attorney's Office, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by BuzzFeed Inc...(Swaminathan, Anand) Modified on 9/14/2021 (pc). (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-137FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Attorney General, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by BuzzFeed Inc...(Swaminathan, Anand) Modified on 9/14/2021 (pc). (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-14***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Anand Swaminathan to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Only parties listed on the complaint caption title can be issued a summons. If you wish to serve at this address, list the defendant's name followed by c/o;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-148REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney General, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by BuzzFeed Inc...(Swaminathan, Anand) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-149REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, United States Attorney's Office, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by BuzzFeed Inc...(Swaminathan, Anand) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-15Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 12/1/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-1510ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department Of Justice..(pc) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-1511ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department Of Justice..(pc) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-2712RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BuzzFeed Inc...(Swaminathan, Anand) (Entered: 09/27/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar