Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMaersk Line, Limited v. United States Coast Guard
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityNorfolk
Case Number2:2021cv00501
Date Filed2021-09-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Roderick C. Young
PlaintiffMaersk Line, Limited
Case DescriptionMaersk Line Limited submitted several FOIA requests to U.S. Coast Guard for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After Maersk Line contacted the agency for a status update, the agency indicated it could not begin processing the requests for another six months. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Maersk Line filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Coast Guard
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-091Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7988048.), filed by Maersk Line, Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibson, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-092Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Maersk Line, Limited. (Gibson, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-09Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-10-213NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Maersk Line, Limited (Gibson, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-264FINAL ORDER: For good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 10/26/21. (jhie, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar