Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREED SMITH LLP v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02387
Date Filed2021-09-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffREED SMITH LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Reed Smith LLP submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning communications between the FDA and the Pharmacy Compounding Advisory Committee pertaining to (a) nicotinamide adeline dinucleotide or (b) the criteria used to determine whether bulk drugs should appear on the list pursuant to 503A(b)(1)(A)(i)(III). The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Reed Smith filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-101COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8723261) filed by REED SMITH LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request and Request Confirmation, # 2 Exhibit FDA FOIA Request Confirmation Email, # 3 Exhibit August 9 Email and Acknowledgement Letter, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons FDA, # 6 Summons Attorney General, # 7 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Segroves, James) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by REED SMITH LLP (Segroves, James) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-13Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-133STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 13, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-144SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-295NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-09-296Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-09-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 6 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and DIRECTING that defendant file a responsive pleading or motion by November 3, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 29, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-10-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 11/3/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar