Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUrban Justice Center et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv07587
Date Filed2021-09-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jesse M. Furman
PlaintiffUrban Justice Center
PlaintiffASISTA Immigration Assistance, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Urban Justice Center and ASISTA Immigration Center submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning training for USCIS employees on how to recognize whether a pending Form I-918 and or Form I-918A are bona fide. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Urban Justice Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-101COMPLAINT against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25046130)Document filed by Urban Justice Center, ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter from Kyle Dandelet, # 2 Exhibit B - Letter from Terri White).(Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-102CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-103RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Urban Justice Center..(Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-104RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Inc...(Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-105NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle A. Dandelet on behalf of ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Inc., Urban Justice Center..(Dandelet, Kyle) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-106REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Inc., Urban Justice Center..(Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-13CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-13Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-13Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-137ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services..(pc) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-138ORDER: This case arises under the Freedom of Information Act, Title 5, United States Code, Section 552. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint letter, no later than two weeks from the date of this order and not to exceed two pages, indicating whether there is any need for discovery or an initial conference in this case. If there is no such need, the parties should include in their letter a proposed briefing schedule for any motions, including motions for summary judgment. If Defendant has not yet entered a notice of appearance, Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file proof of such service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/13/2021) (va) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-209AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. Document filed by Urban Justice Center; ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Inc...(Dandelet, Kyle) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-2010NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Schessler Poscablo on behalf of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services..(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-2411LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Christine S. Poscablo dated September 24, 2021 re: Joint Letter in Accordance with Court's September 13, 2021 Order. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services..(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-09-2412MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 11 Letter filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. On or before October 27, 2021, Parties shall submit a joint status letter updating the Court on the parties' progress. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/24/2021) (ama) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-10-1313ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services..(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-2614STATUS REPORT. and Request for Permission to Submit Further Status Report on or before December 21, 2021 Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services..(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-2715MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 14 Status Report filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, requesting permission to submit a furtherstatus update to the Court on before December 21, 2021. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/27/2021) (js) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar