Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02405
Date Filed2021-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionThe American Wild Horse Campaign submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning contracts for BLM helicopter roundup services for fiscal year 2020. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-131COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8727371) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Quaranto, Lance) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-14Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (znmg) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-142SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-283NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar