Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDOWNS LAW GROUP, P.A. v. UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02407
Date Filed2021-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffDOWNS LAW GROUP, P.A.
Case DescriptionThe Downs Law Group submitted several FOIA requests to U.S. Coast Guard for records concerning the agency's role in the Deep Horizon accident. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The law firm also learned that historical records about the Deep Horizon accident had been transferred to the National Archives and Records Administration. Downs Law Group also requested records from NARA. The Downs Law Group filed an administrative appeal after NARA failed to respond. After hearing nothing further from the Coast Guard, the Downs Law Group filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES COAST GUARD
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES COAST GUARD ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8728410) filed by THE DOWNS LAW GROUP, P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Coast Guard, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons USAO, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-14Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-152SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-10-153RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/21/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/21/2021. (Sorenson, C.); Modified date of service and answer deadline on 10/18/2021 (ztth). (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/21/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES COAST GUARD served on 9/20/2021. (See Docket Entry 3 to view document) (ztth) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-185GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 18, 2021. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-186ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-18MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before November 16, 2021, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing further proceedings. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 18, 2021. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2021 (hs) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar