Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMayfield v. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityFort Worth
Case Number4:2021cv01048
Date Filed2021-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reed C. O'Connor
PlaintiffKimberly P. Mayfield
Case DescriptionKimberly Mayfield, an attorney, submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning training and other issues relevant to litigation in which Mayfield was involved. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency provided some records in response to one request and told Mayfield that it had sent predisclosure notice to a company in the housing industry. Mayfield also submitted a FOIA request to OPM for records showing registrations and payments made by HUD. OPM acknowledged receipt of that request. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Mayfield filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
DefendantU.S. Office of Personnel Management
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kimberly P. Mayfield. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12210069) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements and Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Mayfield, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-132CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kimberly P. Mayfield. (Mayfield, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-133New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O'Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-134Summons issued as to U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, U.S. Office of Personnel Management, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (pef) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-255SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development; served on 09/16/2021, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (U.S. Attorney); served on 09/16/2021, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (U.S. Attorney General); served on 09/16/2021. SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Office of Personnel Management; served on 09/16/2021, U.S. Office of Personnel Management (U.S. Attorney); served on 09/16/2021, U.S. Office of Personnel Management (U.S. Attorney General); served on 09/16/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration(s) HUD, # 2 Declaration(s) OPM) (Mayfield, Kimberly) Modified docket entry and service dates on 9/28/2021 (pef). (Entered: 09/25/2021)
2021-10-156ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, filed by U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Tami C Parker-DOJ added to party U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development(pty:dft) (Parker-DOJ, Tami) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-157MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint,,,, Specific Allegations therein filed by U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Parker-DOJ, Tami) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-158Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by U.S. Office of Personnel Management with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Tami C Parker-DOJ added to party U.S. Office of Personnel Management(pty:dft) (Parker-DOJ, Tami) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-159CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, U.S. Office of Personnel Management. (Parker-DOJ, Tami) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar