Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02418
Date Filed2021-09-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FDA, the Centers for Disease Control, and the National Institute of Health for records concerning biodistribution studies for the Pfizer, Moderna, and Johnson & Johnson vaccines. The FDA and CDC acknowledged receipt of the requests. NIH told Judicial Watch that it did not possess the records, which were maintained by the Biomedical Advanced Research and Development Authority. Judicial Watch submitted the request to BARDA. BARDA acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-141COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8732020) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-15Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/17/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/17/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/22/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 9/21/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-10-087MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathryn B. Blankenberg, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8789846. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
2021-10-08MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kathryn B. Blankenberg is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/8/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
2021-10-088NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Brooke Blankenberg on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Blankenberg, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar