Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02427
Date Filed2021-09-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between the Civil Rights Division and other outside voting advocacy groups pertaining to the Voting Right Act suit against the State of Georgia. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8734204) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-15Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/17/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/17/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/22/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/22/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-10-187ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Davis, Elliott) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-18MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before November 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/18/2021. (lcabj1) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar