Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMenjivar et al v. Executive Office for Immigration Review
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2021cv02355
Date Filed2021-09-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James K. Bredar
PlaintiffLennis Landaverde Menjivar
PlaintiffFernando Turcios Escobar
PlaintiffAda Rodas Sanchez
PlaintiffRigoberto Garcia Zavala
PlaintiffCarlos Pena Sanchez
PlaintiffMarta Campos Martinez
PlaintiffMauricio Antonio Padilla
PlaintiffAlfredo Tuangco
PlaintiffEnna Campos Ulloa
PlaintiffAdriana Trejos Garcia
PlaintiffMaria Lucero
PlaintiffLebert James
PlaintiffJose Chavarria Alfaro
PlaintiffDora Argueta
PlaintiffWilber Ramos Diaz
PlaintiffJairo Posadas Mendoza
PlaintiffEmeka Obijuru
PlaintiffAuxiliadora Hernandez Luna
PlaintiffVasquez Santos Diaz
PlaintiffYesel Turcios Gonzalez
PlaintiffErika Amaya Calderon
PlaintiffPablo Cedillos
PlaintiffJuan Medina Cruz
PlaintiffLindel Godoy Alvarenga
PlaintiffRoberto Orellana Cruz
PlaintiffWyatt Molina Rodriguez
PlaintiffJuan Leon Asmen
PlaintiffOscar Vasquez Turcios
PlaintiffAdeolu Onasanya
PlaintiffKarina Gomez Rodriguez
PlaintiffJonathan Enamorado Leon
PlaintiffDesire Fadion
PlaintiffDaniel Gomez Rodriguez
PlaintiffJuan Bin Chi
PlaintiffManuel Amaya Saravia
PlaintiffSamuel Alfaro Salinas
PlaintiffVictor Privado Membreno
PlaintiffWendy Hernandez Berrios
PlaintiffMarina Sanchez Sanchez
PlaintiffSandra Moran Castillo
PlaintiffKeith Shaw
PlaintiffJuan Bacca Gutierrez
PlaintiffYudy Arias Aguilar
PlaintiffCyril Iweh
PlaintiffEmilio Diaz Amaya
PlaintiffJulio Gonzalez Chavez
PlaintiffIrma Velasquez Mendez
PlaintiffAleida Lopez Velasquez
PlaintiffDamaris Lopez Velasquez
PlaintiffAnyi Ayala Sanchez
PlaintiffJosue Saravia Saravia
PlaintiffGabriela Gonzalez Chavez
PlaintiffAnthony Campos Guevara
PlaintiffEdin Mejia Alvarenga
PlaintiffJose Flores Zelaya
PlaintiffMilagro Cruz De Flores
PlaintiffElias Rivera Monterola
PlaintiffJose Castillo Reyes
PlaintiffRaul Cruz Interiano
PlaintiffEverton Ribeiro
PlaintiffWilliams Baca Gomez
PlaintiffCarlos Trigueros Barillas
PlaintiffSusika Kalpitha Pelawata
Case DescriptionLennis Landaverde Menjivar and a number of others submitted FOIA requests to the Executive Office for Immigration Review for records concerning their immigration court files. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further, Menjivar and other plaintiffs filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-151COMPLAINT against Executive Office for Immigration Review (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 14637129724), filed by Daniel Gomez Rodriguez, Desire Fadion, Susika Kalpitha Pelawata, Erika Amaya Calderon, Mauricio Antonio Padilla, Wyatt Molina Rodriguez, Auxiliadora Hernandez Luna, Jairo Posadas Mendoza, Cyril Iweh, Jose Flores Zelaya, Juan Leon Asmen, Elias Rivera Monterola, Williams Baca Gomez, Yesel Turcios Gonzalez, Adriana Trejos Garcia, Jonathan Enamorado Leon, Manuel Amaya Saravia, Maria Lucero, Aleida Lopez Velasquez, Adeolu Onasanya, Anyi Ayala Sanchez, Marina Sanchez Sanchez, Keith Shaw, Jose Castillo Reyes, Lebert James, Wilber Ramos Diaz, Gabriela Gonzalez Chavez, Everton Ribeiro, Milagro Cruz De Flores, Emilio Diaz Amaya, Vasquez Santos Diaz, Carlos Trigueros Barillas, Edin Mejia Alvarenga, Fernando Turcios Escobar, Emeka Obijuru, Lennis Landaverde Menjivar, Karina Gomez Rodriguez, Roberto Orellana Cruz, Oscar Vasquez Turcios, Sandra Moran Castillo, Dora Argueta, Raul Cruz Interiano, Damaris Lopez Velasquez, Lindel Godoy Alvarenga, Anthony Campos Guevara, Juan Bacca Gutierrez, Pablo Cedillos, Julio Gonzalez Chavez, Juan Medina Cruz, Jose Chavarria Alfaro, Marta Campos Martinez, Samuel Alfaro Salinas, Ada Rodas Sanchez, Josue Saravia Saravia, Enna Campos Ulloa, Irma Velasquez Mendez, Wendy Hernandez Berrios, Alfredo Tuangco, Rigoberto Garcia Zavala, Juan Bin Chi, Victor Privado Membreno, Yudy Arias Aguilar, Carlos Pena Sanchez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-162Summons Issued 60 days as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-173CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/17/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-10-08Case Reassigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
2021-10-094SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Gomez Rodriguez, Desire Fadion, Susika Kalpitha Pelawata, Erika Amaya Calderon, Mauricio Antonio Padilla, Wyatt Molina Rodriguez, Auxiliadora Hernandez Luna, Jairo Posadas Mendoza, Cyril Iweh, Jose Flores Zelaya, Juan Leon Asmen, Elias Rivera Monterola, Williams Baca Gomez, Yesel Turcios Gonzalez, Adriana Trejos Garcia, Jonathan Enamorado Leon, Manuel Amaya Saravia, Maria Lucero, Aleida Lopez Velasquez, Adeolu Onasanya, Anyi Ayala Sanchez, Marina Sanchez Sanchez, Keith Shaw, Jose Castillo Reyes, Lebert James, Wilber Ramos Diaz, Gabriela Gonzalez Chavez, Everton Ribeiro, Milagro Cruz De Flores, Emilio Diaz Amaya, Vasquez Santos Diaz, Carlos Trigueros Barillas, Edin Mejia Alvarenga, Fernando Turcios Escobar, Emeka Obijuru, Lennis Landaverde Menjivar, Karina Gomez Rodriguez, Roberto Orellana Cruz, Oscar Vasquez Turcios, Sandra Moran Castillo, Dora Argueta, Raul Cruz Interiano, Damaris Lopez Velasquez, Lindel Godoy Alvarenga, Anthony Campos Guevara, Juan Bacca Gutierrez, Pablo Cedillos, Julio Gonzalez Chavez, Juan Medina Cruz, Jose Chavarria Alfaro, Marta Campos Martinez, Samuel Alfaro Salinas, Ada Rodas Sanchez, Josue Saravia Saravia, Enna Campos Ulloa, Irma Velasquez Mendez, Wendy Hernandez Berrios, Alfredo Tuangco, Rigoberto Garcia Zavala, Juan Bin Chi, Victor Privado Membreno, Yudy Arias Aguilar, Carlos Pena Sanchez. All Defendants.(Davis, Timothy) (Entered: 10/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar