Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02438
Date Filed2021-09-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning administrative wage garnishments. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-161COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8737349) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons To DC USAO, # 3 Summons To US Department of Education, # 4 Summons To USAG)(Elson, Alexander) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Elson, Alexander) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-17Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-10-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/30/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/30/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/30/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 9/29/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Elson, Alexander) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar