Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSIDDIQUI v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02455
Date Filed2021-09-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAAFIA SIDDIQUI
Case DescriptionAafia Siddiqui submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning an incident in which she was assaulted in her cell by another prison. As a result, she was put in administrative segregation pending completion of the investigation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Siddiqui filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-171COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ADCDC-8741279) filed by AAFIA SIDDIQUI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Elbially, Marwa) Modified on 9/20/2021 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-20NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to info@elbiallylaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-202CIVIL COVER SHEET by AAFIA SIDDIQUI re 1 Complaint, filed by AAFIA SIDDIQUI. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by AAFIA SIDDIQUI.(Elbially, Marwa) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-22Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmg) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-294ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/29/2021. (DM) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-10-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/28/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/28/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Elbially, Marwa) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
2021-10-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/28/21., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 9/28/2021. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar