Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBURKE v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02412
Date Filed2021-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffDARRYL BURKE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-13Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 09/13/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmg) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-131COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by DARRYL BURKE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, Verification, and Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit)(znmg) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-132STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 4 ORDER.....MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DARRYL BURKE. (znmg) Modified on 10/6/2021 (ztnr). (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-133PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DARRYL BURKE (znmg) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-244ORDER striking 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDERED that within 30 days from the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall file an amended motion for leave to proceed IFP with a caption appropriate for this court. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/24/2021. (znmg) (Entered: 10/06/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar