Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleROGOPOULOS v. U.S. DEPT. OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02413
Date Filed2021-09-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffWILLIAM ROGOPOULOS
DefendantU.S. DEPT. OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-10Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/10/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmg) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPT. OF THE TREASURY filed by WILLIAM ROGOPOULOS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit) (znmg) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-102MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WILLIAM ROGOPOULOS. (znmg) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-163NOTICE of Change of Address by WILLIAM ROGOPOULOS (znmg) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-244PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/24/2021. (znmg) (Entered: 10/05/2021)
2021-10-125Letter by WILLIAM ROGOPOULOS re 4 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement (znmg) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar