Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWP COMPANY LLC v. U.S DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02458
Date Filed2021-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffWP COMPANY LLC
doing business as WASHINGTON POST
Case DescriptionThe WP Company, the parent company of the Washington Post, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Air Force and the Department of the Navy for records concerning foreign-government-employment. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The Navy disclosed 494 pages of record with redaction under Exemption 4 (commercial and confidential), Exemption 5 (privileges), and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). The Navy disclosed an additional 502 pages with redactions. The Washington Post filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The Navy indicated that since these records would be affected by the decision in a related case involving the Department of Defense, the Navy declined to resolve the appeal. The Air Force acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Post that it would begin to process the request. After hearing nothing further from either agency, the Washington Post filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-201COMPLAINT against U.S DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8743325) filed by WP COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Related Case Form, # 11 Proposed Summons to US Dep't of the Air Force, # 12 Proposed Summons to US Dep't of the Navy, # 13 Proposed Summons to US Attorney's Office, # 14 Proposed Summons to US Attorney General)(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-202REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to United States Attorney re 1 Complaint,, filed by WP COMPANY LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by WP COMPANY LLC.(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-203NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by WP COMPANY LLC. Case related to Case No. 21-cv-1025. (zsb) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-204LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WP COMPANY LLC (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-215SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ); Modified text on 9/23/2021 (ztth). (Entered: 09/21/2021)
2021-09-236SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (ztth); Modified text on 9/23/2021 (ztth). (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/23/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/23/2021. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 09/27/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar